This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 03:16:13 (UTC).

KIM, HOWARD SUNGJI VS LEE, JAE YEUN

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 KIM, HOWARD SUNGJI filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against LEE, JAE YEUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COHEN, LAURA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0123

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COHEN, LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KIM HOWARD SUNGJI

Respondent

LEE JAE YEUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KIM KI HYON

 

Court Documents

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Denied.

1/7/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Denied.

Miscellaneous - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM...

1/7/2022: Miscellaneous - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM...

Petition - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

1/7/2022: Petition - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

Proof of Service

1/21/2022: Proof of Service

Minute Order

1/27/2022: Minute Order

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

1/27/2022: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

1/27/2022: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Minute Order

2/18/2022: Minute Order

Witness List - Witness List

2/10/2022: Witness List - Witness List

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

2/10/2022: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

1/27/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

2/18/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

2/18/2022: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Minute Order

3/14/2022: Minute Order

Trial Brief - Trial Brief

3/14/2022: Trial Brief - Trial Brief

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Brief (Trial Brief ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketExhibit List (Exhibit List ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketWitness List (Witness List ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Denied. ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment (non-violence); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous (CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM... ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less