Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 18:54:07 (UTC).

KIM ANN CLEMENS VS CURTIS SOMMERS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 KIM ANN CLEMENS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CURTIS SOMMERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8120

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CLEMENS KIM ANN

CLS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CLS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

SOMMERS CURTIS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

SOMMERS CURTIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BLAIN TONY

BLAIN TONY ESQ.

GOLDSTEIN CARY W. ESQ.

BARILICH SUSAN MARIE

BARILICH SUSAN ESQ.

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

BARILICH SUSAN MARIE

BARILICH SUSAN ESQ.

NEWMAN CAROL L.

NEWMAN CAROL L. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

NEWMAN CAROL L.

NEWMAN CAROL L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER; EXHIBIT A

5/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER; EXHIBIT A

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/03/2021

5/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/03/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/10/2021

3/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/10/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER; EXHIBIT A

3/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER; EXHIBIT A

Reply - REPLY BY CROSS-DEFENDANT CLEMENS TO OPPOSITION OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT SOMMERS TO MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/4/2021: Reply - REPLY BY CROSS-DEFENDANT CLEMENS TO OPPOSITION OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT SOMMERS TO MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice

2/26/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/28/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

1/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER; EXHIBIT A

2/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER; EXHIBIT A

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/21/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

1/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

10/13/2020: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

10/14/2020: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

9/10/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Answer

7/20/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

7/2/2020: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • Hearing06/28/2021 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER; EXHIBIT A); Filed by Kim Ann Clemens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 3:55 PM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/11/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Kim Ann Clemens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (by Cross-Defendant Kim Ann Clemens to Cross-Complainant's First Amended Cross-Complaint;) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docketat 10:52 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Curtis Sommers (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Curtis Sommers (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNotice (and Acknowledgment of Receipt--Civil); Filed by Kim Ann Clemens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference; Exhibit A); Filed by Kim Ann Clemens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kim Ann Clemens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kim Ann Clemens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kim Ann Clemens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kim Ann Clemens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEWMAN CAROL LINDA