This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 04:19:49 (UTC).

KILCULLEN, WALTER VS KRAUT, MICHAEL E.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 KILCULLEN, WALTER filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against KRAUT, MICHAEL E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SPEAR, EMILY T., RIFF, LAWRENCE P. and CONVEY, MICHAEL J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2869

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SPEAR, EMILY T.

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

CONVEY, MICHAEL J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KILCULLEN WALTER

Respondent

KRAUT MICHAEL E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MILLER KATHARINE ARAUJO

Respondent Attorney

BERK BLAIR BERNHOLZ

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/14/2020: Minute Order

Response - Civil Harassment

7/29/2020: Response - Civil Harassment

Memorandum - Points and Authorities

9/25/2020: Memorandum - Points and Authorities

Memorandum - Points and Authorities

9/25/2020: Memorandum - Points and Authorities

Notice - OF MINUTE ORDER

9/15/2020: Notice - OF MINUTE ORDER

Notice - OF MINUTE ORDER

9/15/2020: Notice - OF MINUTE ORDER

Motion - RESPONDENT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

8/17/2020: Motion - RESPONDENT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

Minute Order

8/17/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

8/6/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

8/6/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/3/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

8/3/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Notice - to Appear

7/20/2020: Notice - to Appear

Proof of Service - Personal Service of CH-109, CH-100, CH-120, and CH-250

6/22/2020: Proof of Service - Personal Service of CH-109, CH-100, CH-120, and CH-250

Brief - re TRO Hearing

6/25/2020: Brief - re TRO Hearing

Minute Order

6/26/2020: Minute Order

FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order

6/26/2020: FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketOrder (FORTHWITH ORDER GRANTING IN PART RESPONDENTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 527.6(s) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 77, Convey, Michael J., Presiding; Motion Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 77, Convey, Michael J., Presiding; Motion Hearing - Not Held - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketReply (To Petitioner's Opposition ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketMemorandum - Points and Authorities; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketNotice (to Appear ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 13, Spear, Emily T., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketBrief (re TRO Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (Personal Service of CH-109, CH-100, CH-120, and CH-250 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER KATHARINE ARAUJO