This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 08:35:30 (UTC).

KIKISHIA BURRUS VS THE ANTHEM COMPANIES, INC., AN INDIANA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 KIKISHIA BURRUS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against THE ANTHEM COMPANIES, INC , AN INDIANA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7263

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURRUS KIKISHIA

Defendants

ELEVANCE HEALTH COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ELEVANCE HEALTH INC. AN INDIANA CORPORATION

THE ANTHEM COMPANIES INC. AN INDIANA CORPORATION

THE ELEVANCE COMPANIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SETAREH SHAUN

Defendant Attorney

CRUZ ANAHI

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/24/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/22/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/22/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

8/22/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

8/31/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/31/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/31/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/29/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION

9/27/2022: Notice - NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION

Answer

9/22/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

12/22/2022: Notice of Ruling

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: The Anthem Companies, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant); Elevance Health, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant); Elevance Health Companies of California, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); The Elevance Companies, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 73 updated: Result Date to 12/16/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCase is Deemed Complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNotice to State Court and Plaintiff of Removal of Action; Filed by: Elevance Health, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant); Elevance Health Companies of California, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); The Elevance Companies, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Kikishia Burrus (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Elevance Health, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant); Elevance Health Companies of California, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); The Elevance Companies, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Kikishia Burrus (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kikishia Burrus (Plaintiff); As to: The Anthem Companies, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 08/24/2022; Service Cost: 32.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kikishia Burrus (Plaintiff); As to: Elevance Health Companies of California, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 08/24/2022; Service Cost: 32.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kikishia Burrus (Plaintiff); As to: Elevance Health, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 08/24/2022; Service Cost: 32.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Kikishia Burrus (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketAddress for Shaun Setareh (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Timothy Patrick Dillon in Department 73 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Shaun Setareh (Attorney): First Name changed from Chaim to Shaun; Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kikishia Burrus (Plaintiff); As to: The Anthem Companies, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant); Elevance Health, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant); Elevance Health Companies of California, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kikishia Burrus (Plaintiff); As to: The Anthem Companies, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant); Elevance Health, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant); Elevance Health Companies of California, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kikishia Burrus (Plaintiff); As to: The Anthem Companies, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant); Elevance Health, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant); Elevance Health Companies of California, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less