This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 00:31:12 (UTC).

KIERNEY WALDRON VS GHP MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 KIERNEY WALDRON filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against GHP MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3883

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALDRON KIERNEY

Defendants

GHP MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

PARK SIERRA PROPERTIES LTD

SOLEMINT HEIGHTS PARTNERSHIP LP

SAUGUS COLONY LIMITED

CANYON SIERRA PROPERTIES LLC

VISCONTI APARTMENTS LLC

GH PALMER ASSOCIATES

LR 9TH AND BROADWAY LLC

BRIDEWELL PROPERTIES LTD

PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES II

FIGTER LIMITED

PALMER/CITY CENTER II

4914 OLIVE STREET PROPERTIES LLC

PALMER ST. PAUL PROPERTIES

PALMER FLOWER STREET PROPERTIES

CCV PARTNERSHIP II

PALMER TEMPLE STREET PROPERTIES LLC

EASTON INVESTMENTS II

PARK SIERRA PROPERTIES II

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PARKER JIMMIE DAVIS

LYSLE RICHARD SCOTT

Defendant Attorneys

VELIE ERIK STEPHEN

O'MEARA FRANCES M.

NGUYEN HAO THI

 

Court Documents

Status Report

8/1/2019: Status Report

Minute Order

8/8/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

4/17/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice

4/18/2019: Notice

Notice

4/4/2019: Notice

Minute Order

4/10/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Appearance

3/27/2019: Notice of Appearance

Status Report

4/3/2019: Status Report

Notice of Appearance

3/27/2019: Notice of Appearance

Minute Order

3/22/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/18/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/19/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/7/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Related Case

2/7/2019: Notice of Related Case

Summons

2/7/2019: Summons

Complaint

2/7/2019: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • Hearingat 11:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketJoint Status Report; Filed by Kierney Waldron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Status Conference Proceedings and Order); Filed by Kierney Waldron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (authorizing Electronic service); Filed by Kierney Waldron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Status Conference Proceedings and Order); Filed by Kierney Waldron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketJoint Status Report; Filed by Kierney Waldron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 03/18/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kierney Waldron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kierney Waldron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kierney Waldron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Kierney Waldron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kierney Waldron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kierney Waldron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Kierney Waldron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARK SIERRA PROPERTIES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where SAUGUS COLONY LIMITED A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where PARK SIERRA PROPERTIES II A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant