This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2022 at 11:55:08 (UTC).

KIELA SHONTE MIXON VS WAL-MART STORES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 KIELA SHONTE MIXON filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0977

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIXON KIELA SHONTE

Defendants

TURNER DAWN

WAL-MART STORES INC.

WAL-MART INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DOMINGO MICHAEL DOMINGO

GERARD JOHN FRANCIS

Defendant Attorney

SMITH ANDREW O

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/29/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

3/21/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/3/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

4/22/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

4/22/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2024
  • Hearing12/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • Hearing02/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • Hearing02/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Wal-Mart Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Wal-Mart Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kiela Shonte Mixon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kiela Shonte Mixon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by Kiela Shonte Mixon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Kiela Shonte Mixon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kiela Shonte Mixon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kiela Shonte Mixon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kiela Shonte Mixon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH ANDREW O.