This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2022 at 02:16:32 (UTC).

KIDS FROM THE VALLEY VII, LLC VS WILLIAM B LLC

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 KIDS FROM THE VALLEY VII, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against WILLIAM B LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0174

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIDS FROM THE VALLEY VII LLC

Defendant

WILLIAM B LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEIN CHARLES Z

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

2/4/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (WILLIAM B LLC)

2/4/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (WILLIAM B LLC)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

2/3/2022: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

2/3/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/3/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/3/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • Hearing06/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((William B LLC)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kids From The Valley VII, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Kids From The Valley VII, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kids From The Valley VII, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kids From The Valley VII, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KIDS FROM THE VALLEY VII LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WILLIAM B LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEIN CHARLIE Z.