This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2022 at 12:34:50 (UTC).

KIARA MUHAMMAD VS THE LAW OFFICES OF HALL & LIM, PLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 KIARA MUHAMMAD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE LAW OFFICES OF HALL LIM, PLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9783

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUHAMMAD KIARA

Defendants

HALL TIMOTHY A.

THE LAW OFFICES OF HALL & LIM PLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOHAR DANIEL Y

Defendant Attorney

FEERICK THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/24/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/31/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/31/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

10/12/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/12/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Order

1/5/2022: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/5/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

12/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

12/21/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • Hearing05/23/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • Hearing05/12/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Kiara Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kiara Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by The Law Offices of Hall & Lim, PLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by The Law Offices of Hall & Lim, PLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The Law Offices of Hall & Lim, PLC (Defendant); Timothy A. Hall (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by The Law Offices of Hall & Lim, PLC (Defendant); Timothy A. Hall (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kiara Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kiara Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kiara Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kiara Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kiara Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less