This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 17:24:35 (UTC).

KIANA RAD ET AL VS VIRGINIA SPURGEON

Case Summary

On 05/09/2017 KIANA RAD filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against VIRGINIA SPURGEON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY J. FUJIE, DENNIS J. LANDIN, OWEN LEE KWONG, JOEL L. LOFTON, CHRISTOPHER K. LUI, ROBERT B. BROADBELT and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0670

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY J. FUJIE

DENNIS J. LANDIN

OWEN LEE KWONG

JOEL L. LOFTON

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Guardian Ad Litems and Not Classified By Court

RAD HASSAN

HOJATI MANDANA

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

SPURGEION VIRGINIA

Minors and Not Classified By Court

RAD RYAN

RAD KIANA

Minors, Not Classified By Court and Guardian Ad Litems

RAD RYAN

HOJATI MANDANA

RAD KIANA

Petitioner, Plaintiff, Guardian Ad Litem and Not Classified By Court

HOJATI MANDANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DREYER ROGER A.

DREYER ROGER ARTURO

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

CARNEGIE ALAN J. ESQ.

CARNEGIE ALAN JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

10/18/2019: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Request for Dismissal

3/9/2020: Request for Dismissal

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

2/13/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

2/13/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Notice of Settlement

12/9/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

12/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 12/09/2019

12/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 12/09/2019

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

10/18/2019: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE OF PENDING ...)

11/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE OF PENDING ...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

4/2/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

4/3/2019: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERE...)

4/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERE...)

Notice of Motion

3/6/2019: Notice of Motion

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

3/6/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - Declaration of Thomas Gray in Support of Motion to Continue Trial

3/6/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Thomas Gray in Support of Motion to Continue Trial

Notice of Motion - FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

3/14/2019: Notice of Motion - FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Declaration - DECLARATION OF THOMAS J. GRAY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

3/14/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF THOMAS J. GRAY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - FIRST AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

3/14/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - FIRST AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mandana Hojati (Legacy Party); Kiana Rad (Legacy Party); Ryan Rad (Legacy Party) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Mandana Hojati (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Mandana Hojati (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docketat 4:19 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Hassan Rad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MANDANA HOJATI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hassan Rad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON-CONFLICT BY ATTORNEY REPRESENTING NOMINEE AND MINOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0670    Hearing Date: November 05, 2019    Dept: 4A

Petition to Approve Minor’s Compromise (x2)

Having considered the petitioning papers, the Court rules as follows.  No opposing papers were filed.

BACKGROUND

On May 9, 2017, Plaintiffs Kiana Rad and Ryan Rad, by and through their guardian ad litem Mandana Hojati; Mandana Hojati, and Hassan Rad filed a complaint against defendant Virginia Spurgeon (“Defendant”) alleging negligence for a head-on vehicle collision that occurred on October 22, 2016.

On October 18, 2019, Petitioner Mandana Hojati filed petitions to approve compromises of pending actions for Plaintiffs Kiana and Ryan.

Trial is set for January 22, 2020.

PARTY’S REQUESTS

Petitioner Aaron Mandana Hojati (“Petitioner”) requests that the Court grant petitions to approve a compromise of pending actions for Plaintiff Kiana (“Claimant Kiana”) and Plaintiff Ryan (“Claimant Ryan”).

LEGAL STANDARD

Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952(a), Petitioner, Claimant Kiana, and Claimant Ryan are required to attend the hearing on the petition.  However, the Court finds that Claimant Kiana’s and Claimant Ryan’s attendance are not required due to their age and the settlement amount.

DISCUSSION

The Court finds the petitions should be approved.

All of the required attachments are included with the petitions.

Claimant Kiana is to receive a gross settlement of $3,000,000 from USAA Insurance on behalf of Defendant.  $13,194.77 of the gross settlement is to be paid for medical expenses.  Of this $13,194.77, $8,471.50 is to be reimburse to Petitioner for paid medical expenses, $3,015.52 is to be paid to Meridian Resource Co., and $1,707.75 is to be paid to Rawlings Co.

$900,000 of the gross settlement is to be paid for attorney’s fees, which represents 33% of the gross settlement.  This is a reasonable amount after considering the amount of work Petitioner’s counsel performed in this matter as detailed in Attachment 14a.  $4,541.81 of the gross settlement represents costs that are to be paid to Petitioner’s counsel.  The remaining $2,082,263.42 net settlement is to be invested in a single-premium deferred annuity subject to withdrawal only from a Court order pursuant to the terms within Attachment 19a(3) of the petition.

Claimant Ryan is to receive a gross settlement of $50,000 from USAA Insurance on behalf of Defendant.  $825.37 of the gross settlement is to be paid to The Rawlings Company for a medical lien.  No costs or attorney’s fees are to be taken from the gross settlement.  The remaining $49,174.63 net settlement is to be invested in a single-premium deferred annuity subject to withdrawal only from a Court order pursuant to the terms within Attachment 19a(3) of the petition.

The petitions for minors’ compromise filed on October 18, 2019 for Claimant Kiana and Claimant Ryan are APPROVED.

The Court shall sign the proposed orders concurrently filed with the October 18, 2019 petitions for minors’ compromise.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice of this ruling.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARNEGIE ALAN