This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2021 at 23:11:39 (UTC).

KIANA FLEMING VS MOLINO TERRACE HOMEOWNERS', ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/31/2018 KIANA FLEMING filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MOLINO TERRACE HOMEOWNERS'. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0169

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLEMING KIANA

Defendants

THRINAYNEE

MOLINO TERRACE HOMEOWNERS'

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DROUET BRETT CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorneys

ZURAWSKI JAMES P.

RICE JOHN DEAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

11/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Firm Name

8/19/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/17/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ZARA

7/26/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ZARA

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/30/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/16/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/16/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

4/17/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

4/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 04/28/2020

4/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 04/28/2020

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/12/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/12/2020: Answer

Other - - NOTICE OF REJECTION-APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ZARA

6/3/2019: Other - - NOTICE OF REJECTION-APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ZARA

Notice of Lien

2/8/2019: Notice of Lien

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/31/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/31/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • Hearing12/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • Hearing10/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Hearing10/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Molino Terrace Homeowners' (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Molino Terrace Homeowners' (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Molino Terrace Homeowners' (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Kiana Fleming (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kiana Fleming (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kiana Fleming (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kiana Fleming (Plaintiff); Zara Roche (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Zara); Filed by Kiana Fleming (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection-Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Zara; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by Kiana Fleming (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kiana Fleming (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kiana Fleming (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZURAWSKI JAMES P. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICE JOHN DEAN