This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2018 at 05:40:48 (UTC).

KIA ANDERSON VS TODAYS FRESH START CHARTER SCHOOL ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2017 KIA ANDERSON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TODAYS FRESH START CHARTER SCHOOL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT L. HESS and RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6124

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT L. HESS

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ANDERSON KIA

Respondents and Defendants

PARKER JEANETTE

TODAY'S FRESH START CHARTER SCHOOL

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RODRIGUEZ GRISELDA S. ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

BRODSKY BARRY Z. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

6/11/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/12/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

12/8/2017: Minute Order

TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

12/8/2017: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

12/8/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

12/12/2017: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

CIVIL DEPOSIT

11/21/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Unknown

11/7/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/27/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

10/20/2017: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Unknown

10/13/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/13/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PLAINTIFF KIA ANDERSON'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO THE HONORABLE ROBERT L. HESS (C.C.P. 170.6)

9/19/2017: PLAINTIFF KIA ANDERSON'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO THE HONORABLE ROBERT L. HESS (C.C.P. 170.6)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/21/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/21/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

9/25/2017: Minute Order

SUMMONS

9/15/2017: SUMMONS

PLAINTIFF KIA ANDERSON'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) DISABILITY HARASSMENT (CAL. GOVT. CODE 1294O (J) AND (K)); ETC

9/15/2017: PLAINTIFF KIA ANDERSON'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) DISABILITY HARASSMENT (CAL. GOVT. CODE 1294O (J) AND (K)); ETC

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2018
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (entire action of all parties & all causes of action without prejudice ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Notice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Stipulation (STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Order-Case Management; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Order (TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEE DEPOSIT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT JURY FEES $150.00 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT JURY FEES $150.00 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Answer to Unverified Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • at 01:30 pm in Department 24, Robert L. Hess, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (RE: PLAINTIFF KIA ANDERSON ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TODAY'S FRESH START INC. A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT BENEFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRODSKY BARRY ZITRON