This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 23:11:44 (UTC).

KHOI DUONG, ET AL. VS ANTONIO RIVERO

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 KHOI DUONG filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANTONIO RIVERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6479

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HUYNH TAI

NGUYEN HOANG TU

DUONG KHOI

Defendant

RIVERO ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DINH THOMAS

Defendant Attorney

DEMAIO MICHELLE MARIE BROWN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

12/22/2020: Notice of Related Case

Answer

12/22/2020: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

1/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) OF 01/08/2021

1/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) OF 01/08/2021

Request for Dismissal

2/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

10/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

10/1/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/23/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Khoi Duong (Plaintiff); Tai Huynh (Plaintiff); Hoang Tu Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases) of 01/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Antonio Rivero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Antonio Rivero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Khoi Duong (Plaintiff); Tai Huynh (Plaintiff); Hoang Tu Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Khoi Duong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Khoi Duong (Plaintiff); Tai Huynh (Plaintiff); Hoang Tu Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEMAIO MICHELLE MARIE BROWN