Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2021 at 17:04:28 (UTC).

KHLOE MORRIS,, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, HEATHER HUTCHINSON VS BIG LOTS STORES, INC., AN OHIO CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 KHLOE MORRIS,, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, HEATHER HUTCHINSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BIG LOTS STORES, INC , AN OHIO CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1896

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

BIG LOTS STORES INC. AN OHIO CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PETROUSIAN ARTHUR M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/29/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2024
  • Hearing03/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Hearing09/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Khloe Morris,, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Heather Hutchinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Khloe Morris,, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Heather Hutchinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIG LOTS STORES INC A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETROUSIAN ARTHUR M.