This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2022 at 23:52:23 (UTC).

KHATCHIK BEILERIAN VS RODNEY RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 KHATCHIK BEILERIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RODNEY RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9867

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEILERIAN KHATCHIK

Defendant

RAMIREZ RODNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MGDESYAN GEORGE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/17/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/17/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/17/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/17/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/17/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2024
  • Hearing06/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2023
  • Hearing12/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2023
  • Hearing12/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Khatchik Beilerian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Khatchik Beilerian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Khatchik Beilerian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MGDESYAN GEORGE G. ESQ.