This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 22:02:30 (UTC).

KHAN, ZOYA VS KHAN, FAHAD

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 KHAN, ZOYA filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against KHAN, FAHAD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STREIMER, LAURA, ROBERTS, GARY D and ARIAN, LEE S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1514

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STREIMER, LAURA

ROBERTS, GARY D

ARIAN, LEE S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KHAN ZOYA

Respondent

KHAN FAHAD

Guardian Ad Litem

KHAN MUHAMMAD TAJ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THOMAS KENDRA

Respondent Attorneys

HORAITES ANTHONY MILTON

TRUTANICH DOMINIC JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

2/17/2023: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Order - Court Appointed Counsel Child/Minor

2/24/2023: Order - Court Appointed Counsel Child/Minor

Proposed Order - Court Appointed Minor Counsel

2/21/2023: Proposed Order - Court Appointed Minor Counsel

Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR A CHILD REGARDING QUALIFICATIONS (Declarations)

2/21/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR A CHILD REGARDING QUALIFICATIONS (Declarations)

Minute Order

2/17/2023: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

2/8/2023: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

2/8/2023: Minute Order

Declaration - late filing

2/8/2023: Declaration - late filing

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

2/8/2023: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

2/8/2023: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Trial Brief - Trial Brief

2/7/2023: Trial Brief - Trial Brief

Witness List - Witness List

2/7/2023: Witness List - Witness List

Witness List

2/1/2023: Witness List

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

1/13/2023: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

1/13/2023: Minute Order

Response - Civil Harassment (violence) - Response - Civil Harassment (violence)

1/9/2023: Response - Civil Harassment (violence) - Response - Civil Harassment (violence)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

11/23/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

11/23/2022: Minute Order

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • Hearing03/29/2023 at 8:30 AM in Department F46 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Restraining Order Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOrder - Court Appointed Counsel Child/Minor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketProposed Order - Court Appointed Minor Counsel; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR A CHILD REGARDING QUALIFICATIONS (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F46, Arian, Lee S., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F46, Arian, Lee S., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDeclaration (late filing ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (CH-109, CH-110, CH-100 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketApplication for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment (violence); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less