Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 01:43:20 (UTC).

KHALID HASHMI VS BERSHIRE HATHAWAY AUTOMOTIVE INC

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 KHALID HASHMI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BERSHIRE HATHAWAY AUTOMOTIVE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3982

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HASHMI KHALID

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 150

BERSHIRE HATHAWAY AUTOMOTIVE INC

LUCKY JAMES

SOUTH COUNTY LEXUS

MVVT MOTORS LLC. DBA SOUTH COUNTY LEXUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WEISSMAN DONALD ESQ.

BHATIA SUNJAY PREM

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

PRENOVOST THOMAS J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

8/31/2018: Substitution of Attorney

NOTICE OF LIEN

9/14/2018: NOTICE OF LIEN

Substitution of Attorney

9/20/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

9/20/2018: Substitution of Attorney

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY?S LIEN

10/3/2018: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY?S LIEN

Proof of Service by Mail

4/19/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

4/19/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Substitution of Attorney

4/25/2019: Substitution of Attorney

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

6/10/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

Substitution of Attorney

7/1/2019: Substitution of Attorney

MVVT MOTORS, LLC DBA SOUTH COUNTY LEXUS AT MISSION VIEJO?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/2/2018: MVVT MOTORS, LLC DBA SOUTH COUNTY LEXUS AT MISSION VIEJO?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/8/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

2/14/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

2/14/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Khalid Hashmi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by MVVT MOTORS LLC. dba SOUTH COUNTY LEXUS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Khalid Hashmi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Khalid Hashmi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Jonathan A. Rapel (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Khalid Hashmi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • NOTICE OF ATTORNEY S LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Khalid Hashmi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Khalid Hashmi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • MVVT MOTORS, LLC DBA SOUTH COUNTY LEXUS AT MISSION VIEJO S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Answer; Filed by MVVT MOTORS LLC. dba SOUTH COUNTY LEXUS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Khalid Hashmi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Khalid Hashmi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693982    Hearing Date: January 10, 2020    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

KHALID HASHMI,

BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY AUTOMOTIVE, INC. , et al.,

Case No.:  BC693982

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 3 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented. 

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE CENTRAL DISTRICT, JUDGE WILLIAM FAHEY presiding in DEPT. 69 of the STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.  

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference.  Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

UPON RECEIPT OF THIS NOTICE, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL GIVE NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES OF RECORD.

DATED: January 10, 2020 ___________________________

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRENOVOST THOMAS J