This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2022 at 10:23:26 (UTC).

KHALEDA BEGUM, VS MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 KHALEDA BEGUM, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4887

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEGUM KHALEDA

CADENA DESTINY

CORTES DIEGO

CORTES MEGGAN A.

CURTI ALMA

CURTI RODOLFO G. IV

DANTUS CLIVINS

DANTUS ELIZABETH

ELLIS ANDREA

FIGUEROA INEZ

FUNES VICTOR

GONZALEZ CELESTE

GONZALEZ LEONOR

GUEVARA STEVE

JINGLES HELEN

Defendants

CITY OF CARSON

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC.

LIBERTY PROPERTY LP

LOS ANGELES COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VITALE THERESA E.

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

11/1/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/1/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/1/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Related Case

11/3/2022: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 11/22/2022

11/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 11/22/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

11/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 11/28/2022

11/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 11/28/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

11/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

11/30/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES

12/6/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Order Re: Related Cases; Filed by: Khaleda Begum, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Order RE Complex Determination; Filed by: Khaleda Begum, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: Khaleda Begum, (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 11/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 22STCV34887, 21STCV38929, 22STCV35650 are related; case number 21STCV38929 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Notice of Related Case;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Notice of Related Case;) of 11/28/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 11 - Hon. David S. Cunningham III; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Jazaiah J. Taufaao-Fuamatu (Plaintiff): Name Suffix: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Destiny Cadena (Plaintiff): Name Suffix: blank; Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- De'Shawn Carter (Plaintiff): Name Suffix: blank; Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Khaleda Begum, (Plaintiff); As to: Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Defendant); Prologis, Inc. (Defendant); Liberty Property, LP (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Khaleda Begum, (Plaintiff); As to: Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Defendant); Prologis, Inc. (Defendant); Liberty Property, LP (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC.; is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VITALE THERESA E.