This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2020 at 09:38:49 (UTC).

KHALED ATIA VS WILLIAM BRENNAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 KHALED ATIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WILLIAM BRENNAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4709

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATIA KHALED

Defendants

BRENNAN WILLIAM

K360 BRENTWOOD MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

K360 STUDIO CITY MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZADEGAN RAMIN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/5/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/6/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/24/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/24/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/28/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

4/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Request for Dismissal

5/26/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by KHALED ATIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by KHALED ATIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by KHALED ATIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by KHALED ATIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KHALED ATIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KHALED ATIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KHALED ATIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less