This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2020 at 22:25:22 (UTC).

KHAILEE GARLAND VS PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 03/01/2018 KHAILEE GARLAND filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5922

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

DOES 1 TO 200

Guardian Ad Litems and Not Classified By Court

GARLAND KASEY

GARLAND KHAILEE

Minor and Not Classified By Court

GARLAND KHAILEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DOUMANIAN NANCY P. ESQ.

DOUMANIAN NANCY PRAPION ESQ.

Minor Attorney

MOLCHAN JEFFREY L. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

MOLCHAN JEFFREY L ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/15/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

4/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF THE ANNUITY FOR FUTURE PERIODIC PAYMENTS RECEIVED BY PACIFIC LIFE FOR MINOR KHAILEE GARLAND

4/17/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF THE ANNUITY FOR FUTURE PERIODIC PAYMENTS RECEIVED BY PACIFIC LIFE FOR MINOR KHAILEE GARLAND

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Service by Mail

12/4/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

12/4/2019: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

1/9/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/1/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NANCY DOUMANIAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER

3/21/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NANCY DOUMANIAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW: RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...)

8/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW: RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...)

Notice of Settlement

8/7/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW: RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...) OF 08/07/2019

8/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW: RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...) OF 08/07/2019

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/1/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

7/16/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/11/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS -

4/2/2018: SUMMONS -

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

3/22/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. STATUTORY LIABILITY NEGLIGENCE DEMAND FOR 33RY TRIAL

3/1/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. STATUTORY LIABILITY NEGLIGENCE DEMAND FOR 33RY TRIAL

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of the annuity for future periodic payments received by pacific life for minor Khailee Garland); Filed by Khailee Garland (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kasey Garland (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Funding) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketAnswer PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Khailee Garland (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. STATUTORY LIABILITY NEGLIGENCE DEMAND FOR 33RY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695922    Hearing Date: January 09, 2020    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Claimant Khailee Garland (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kasey Garland (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle her claims against Defendant Pasadena Unified School District in exchange for $35,000.00. If approved, $1,600.00 will be used for medical expenses, $8,448.15 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $1,207.42 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $23,744.43 for Claimant to be invested into a single-premium deferred annuity with Pacific Life & Annuity Services, Inc.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. § 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 24% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable.

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the January 9, 2020 hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court finds that Claimant’s appearance is not necessary but will require Petitioner to appear.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.