Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2021 at 03:52:13 (UTC).

KHACHIKYAN, IVETA VS HOVSEPIAN, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 KHACHIKYAN, IVETA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HOVSEPIAN, ROBERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SILBERMAN, HARVEY A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0691

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SILBERMAN, HARVEY A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KHACHIKYAN IVETA

Respondent

HOVSEPIAN ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

BARSEGIAN ANAHID

HATAMIAN MELINEH REGINA

HATAMIAN MEL

Respondent Attorney

NEJADPOUR FARI BARI

Other Attorneys

KHOURY HYSUMI

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/4/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC

1/7/2021: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC

Reply - Declaration

1/8/2021: Reply - Declaration

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC

1/12/2021: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC

Order - Court Appointed Counsel Child/Minor - Hysumi Khoury

1/14/2021: Order - Court Appointed Counsel Child/Minor - Hysumi Khoury

Proof of Service - (Electronic Service)

1/22/2021: Proof of Service - (Electronic Service)

Responsive Declaration

12/30/2020: Responsive Declaration

Substitution of Attorney

11/12/2020: Substitution of Attorney

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Attend Mediation Appointment

11/25/2020: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Attend Mediation Appointment

Proof of Service - (Electronic Service)

11/25/2020: Proof of Service - (Electronic Service)

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation

11/25/2020: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation

Proof of Service - (Electronic Service)

12/1/2020: Proof of Service - (Electronic Service)

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

7/17/2020: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service - Mail

7/17/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

Declaration - UCCJEA

7/17/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Proof of Service of Summons

6/8/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/20/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

5/20/2020: Summons

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • Hearing05/11/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department L at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department L, Silberman, Harvey A., Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service ((Electronic Service) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHOURY HYSUMI