This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2022 at 14:31:42 (UTC).

KHACHIK C. ASATRIAN VS GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 KHACHIK C ASATRIAN filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1674

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASATRIAN KHACHIK C.

Defendants

CADILLAC OF BEVERLY HILLS

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR NORMAN F.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/22/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/18/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • Hearing03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Khachik C. Asatrian (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 10/11/2022; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Khachik C. Asatrian (Plaintiff); As to: Cadillac of Beverly Hills (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/14/2022; Service Cost: 82.40; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. H. Jay Ford III in Department O Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Khachik C. Asatrian (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC (Defendant); Cadillac of Beverly Hills (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Khachik C. Asatrian (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC (Defendant); Cadillac of Beverly Hills (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Khachik C. Asatrian (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC (Defendant); Cadillac of Beverly Hills (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CADILLAC OF BEVERLY HILLS is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR NORMAN F.