This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/09/2023 at 01:14:46 (UTC).

KHACHATRYAN, TIGRAN VS KARAPETYAN, MARIETA

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 KHACHATRYAN, TIGRAN filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against KARAPETYAN, MARIETA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PELLMAN, AMY M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0009

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PELLMAN, AMY M.

 

Party Details

Applicant and Petitioner

KHACHATRYAN TIGRAN

Claimants

GRAY SHANNA

HERNANDEZ ROSEMARIE P.

SEARCY WANDA A.

Respondent

KARAPETYAN MARIETA

Not Classified By Court

GASCON GEORGE - District Attorney

ZHAMAKOCHYAN SIRANUSH

GREENBERG HAROLD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Petitioner Attorney

ZHAMAKOCHYAN SIRANUSH

Respondent and Claimant Attorneys

BARSEGYAN ARMINE

GREENBERG HAROLD

 

Court Documents

Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal Full Dismissal of All Appeal Issues

10/10/2023: Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal Full Dismissal of All Appeal Issues

Notice

2/10/2023: Notice

Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal Fee Waiver as to:

6/23/2023: Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal Fee Waiver as to:

Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript NOA 2/3/23 B326704

5/9/2023: Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript NOA 2/3/23 B326704

Notice - Continuance Notice - Continuance - $20.00 (Notices)

4/19/2023: Notice - Continuance Notice - Continuance - $20.00 (Notices)

Minute Order as Order After Hearing

4/19/2023: Minute Order as Order After Hearing

Minute Order

4/19/2023: Minute Order

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued NOA 2/3/23 REPORTER'S FEE

3/24/2023: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued NOA 2/3/23 REPORTER'S FEE

Reply RESPONDENTS REPLY TO PETITIONERS OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES; MPA (Comment)

3/24/2023: Reply RESPONDENTS REPLY TO PETITIONERS OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES; MPA (Comment)

FL_General Family Law 73011Proposed023691a

3/24/2023: FL_General Family Law 73011Proposed023691a

Declaration DECLARATION OF ARMIN BARSEGYAN IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS REPLY TO PETITIONERS OPP (Declarations)

3/24/2023: Declaration DECLARATION OF ARMIN BARSEGYAN IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS REPLY TO PETITIONERS OPP (Declarations)

Responsive Declaration Response Declaration

3/21/2023: Responsive Declaration Response Declaration

Notice - Hearing Notice - Hearing (Notices)

3/15/2023: Notice - Hearing Notice - Hearing (Notices)

Civil Deposit Slip Civil Deposit Slip (Comment)

2/17/2023: Civil Deposit Slip Civil Deposit Slip (Comment)

Motion

2/10/2023: Motion

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

2/9/2023: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/11/2023

DocketRefund Check Processed (TWR #24*1214 10/6/23 REQ. 23179 CHECK 33434773 10/10/23 ); Filed by Depositor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketAppellate Order Dismissing Appeal (Full Dismissal of All Appeal Issues )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketRefund Check Processed (SAP/EFT 1912353266 9/20/23 REQ. 23176 ); Filed by Claimant Reporter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketRefund Check Processed (SAP 1912353267 9/20/23 REQ. 23176 CHECK 1910191092 9/21/23 ); Filed by Claimant Reporter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketRefund Check Processed (SAP 1912353268 9/20/23 REQ. 23176 CHECK 1910191093 9/21/23 ); Filed by Claimant Reporter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketRefund Approved (Unused Transcript); Filed by Depositor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketRefund Approved (Court Reporter Transcript); Filed by Claimant Reporter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketRefund Approved (Court Reporter Transcript); Filed by Claimant Reporter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketRefund Approved (Court Reporter Transcript); Filed by Claimant Reporter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketRefund Initiated (Unused Transcript); Filed by Depositor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
89 More Docket Entries
10/19/2022

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Applicant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Applicant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022

DocketNotice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 (Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 ); Filed by Applicant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022

DocketNotice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 (Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 ); Filed by Applicant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022

DocketDeclaration (Personal Service ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (FOR RETURN OF MINOR CHILDREN TO PETITIONER UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION AND DECLARATION OF ROSA ALARCON ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022

DocketMiscellaneous (POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EXPEDITED PROCEEDINGS UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022

DocketMiscellaneous (MEMORANDUM OF LAW: THE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION, DONE AT THE HAGUE and THE INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION REMEDIES ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022

DocketNotice (OF APPLICATION FOR THE RETURN OF THE MINOR CHILD UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022

DocketApplication (FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND ORDER ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less