This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 22:42:54 (UTC).

KEYTHEA WILSON VS VANESSA CHEN ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/13/2017 KEYTHEA WILSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VANESSA CHEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9261

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

WILSON KEYTHEA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-25

CHEN VANESSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

MITCHELL TIMOTHY P. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

CARANIKAS ALEXIS SOPHIA

 

Court Documents

Notice

6/10/2019: Notice

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

3/27/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Unknown

3/22/2019: Unknown

Answer

3/22/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/1/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Change of Handling Attorney); Filed by Vanessa Chen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Vanessa Chen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Vanessa Chen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Vanessa Chen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Keythea Wilson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Keythea Wilson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Keythea Wilson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9261    Hearing Date: November 25, 2020    Dept: 28

Wilson v. Chen

****9261

Plaintiff’s motions to compel further responses to discovery

Plaintiff moves to compel further responses to her Requests for Production, Form Interrogatories, and Special Interrogatories.  The court has reviewed the moving and opposing papers.  The court rules as follows.

Requests for Production

Form Interrogatories

Special Interrogatories

Defendant is ordered to provide the requested responses within 20 days.


Tentative Rulings - Main Menu     Home


Case Number: ****9261    Hearing Date: November 24, 2020    Dept: 28

Wilson v. Chen

****9261

Plaintiff’s motions to compel further responses to discovery

Plaintiff moves to compel further responses to her Requests for Production, Form Interrogatories, and Special Interrogatories.  The court has reviewed the moving and opposing papers.  The court rules as follows.

Requests for Production

Form Interrogatories

Special Interrogatories

Defendant is ordered to provide the requested responses within 20 days.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARANIKAS ALEXIS S.