This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 04:33:53 (UTC).

KEYA MORGAN VS DAVID AUGUSTA ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/17/2017 KEYA MORGAN filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against DAVID AUGUSTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7993

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORGAN KEYA

Defendants

AUGUSTA DAVID

LEVIN DANNY

GALINDO SARA

TDI PROPERTIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER MILLER MENTHE LLP

Defendant Attorneys

SHAPIRO MARC S. ESQ.

MOSS ROBERT M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT DANNY LEVIN'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF

2/8/2018: DEFENDANT DANNY LEVIN'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KEVA MORGAN TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL

2/8/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KEVA MORGAN TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KEVA MORGAN TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL

2/8/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KEVA MORGAN TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KEYA MORGAN TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,505.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND

2/8/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KEYA MORGAN TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,505.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND

DEFENDANT TDI PROPERTIES SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF

2/8/2018: DEFENDANT TDI PROPERTIES SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT SARA GALINDO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KEYA MORGAN TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCT

2/8/2018: DEFENDANT SARA GALINDO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KEYA MORGAN TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/13/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Unknown

2/23/2018: Unknown

FAITH MORGAN'S RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO DAVID AUGUSTA'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; DECLARATION OF SARA B. POSTER

3/5/2018: FAITH MORGAN'S RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO DAVID AUGUSTA'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; DECLARATION OF SARA B. POSTER

Minute Order

3/5/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/6/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

3/8/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

3/8/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

3/13/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KEVA MORGAN TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM

3/14/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KEVA MORGAN TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM

DEFENDANT TDI PROPERTIES? SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KEYA MORGAN TO PROVIDE

3/14/2018: DEFENDANT TDI PROPERTIES? SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KEYA MORGAN TO PROVIDE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KEYA MORGAN TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION REQUEST FOR

3/14/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KEYA MORGAN TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION REQUEST FOR

DEFENDANT DANNY LEVIN'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KEYA MORGAN TO PROVIDE

3/14/2018: DEFENDANT DANNY LEVIN'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KEYA MORGAN TO PROVIDE

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (MOTION - COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (MOTION - COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; (Motion to Compel; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketPartial Dismissal(not entire case); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
134 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. DEFAMATION PER SE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Keya Morgan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. DEFAMATION PER SE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TDI PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant