This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2021 at 09:20:52 (UTC).

KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS VFX HOLLYWOOD, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L P , A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VFX HOLLYWOOD, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0945

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND II L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

TARIQ ZOHRA

VFX HOLLYWOOD LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ITIKALAPATI PRATIBHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAMS TAYLOR FINDLEY

Other Attorneys

IEZZA NICK

 

Court Documents

Summary of the Case

5/26/2021: Summary of the Case

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/26/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

4/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

3/1/2021: Notice of Ruling

Right to Attach Order After Hearing and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment

3/2/2021: Right to Attach Order After Hearing and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment

Right to Attach Order After Hearing and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment

3/2/2021: Right to Attach Order After Hearing and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)

12/28/2020: Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

12/28/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

12/28/2020: Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

12/28/2020: Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)

12/28/2020: Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)

Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)

12/28/2020: Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/23/2020: Complaint

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • Hearing07/11/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketFOR AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR SEVERAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. I'I 579 AGAINST DEFENDANTS VFX HOLLYWOOD, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AND PRATIBHA ITIKALAPATI, AN INDIVIDUAL ONLY; Filed by KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MARY A. TURNER IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR SEVERAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT lCCP I')585(d)l; Filed by KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (RE: METHOD OF CALCULATING INTEREST); Filed by KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (RE: METHOD OF CALCULATING ATTORNEY'S FEES); Filed by KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Zohra Tariq (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketApplication for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.; Filed by KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities (IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT); Filed by KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040) (as to Zohra Tariq); Filed by KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040) (as to Pratibha Itikalapati); Filed by KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND, II, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20BBCV00945    Hearing Date: February 26, 2021    Dept: A

Writs of attachmentGRANT

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEY STAR CAPITAL FUND II L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IEZZA NICK