This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2023 at 11:33:51 (UTC).

KEVORK KOUYOUMJIAN VS

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 KEVORK KOUYOUMJIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, DOUGLAS W. STERN, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8190

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

DOUGLAS W. STERN

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOUYOUMJIAN KEVORK

Defendant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHENG TONY JAY-LUN

MCKOWN AARON M

Defendant Attorney

RYU THOMAS JAY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/2/2022: Complaint

Case Management Statement

9/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 12/15/2022

12/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 12/15/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/15/2022

12/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/15/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE.)

12/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE.)

Minute Order - (AMENDED)

12/13/2022: Minute Order - (AMENDED)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE.) OF 12/13/2022

12/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE.) OF 12/13/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE.)

12/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE.)

Notice of Related Case

12/12/2022: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASES: R...)

10/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASES: R...)

Notice of Related Case

10/7/2022: Notice of Related Case

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER - CONTINUANCE OF CMC

10/3/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER - CONTINUANCE OF CMC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/22/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

8/2/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order) of 12/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 12/15/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 68 - Hon. Douglas W. Stern

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 20STCV22897, 22STCV18190, 21STLC05442, 21STCV34623, 21STCV42794 are related; case number 20STCV22897 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 12/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 20STCV22897, 21STCV34623, 21STCV42794, and 22STCV18190 consolidated; case number 20STCV22897 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Consolidation Required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 01/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketAddress for Garry S Malin (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kevork Kouyoumjian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kristin S. Escalante in Department 24 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kevork Kouyoumjian (Plaintiff); As to: (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kevork Kouyoumjian (Plaintiff); As to: (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
Please note that some of the information in this case has been redacted.