This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 23:27:58 (UTC).

KEVIN SMITH VS FOUR WINDS RANCH, BUSINESS FORM UNKNOWN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 KEVIN SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FOUR WINDS RANCH, BUSINESS FORM UNKNOWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0901

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH KEVIN

Defendants

GREENSTEIN 1998 FAMILY TRUST BUSINESS FORM UNKNOWN

KARL KRAVES AN INDIVIDUAL

FOUR WINDS RANCH BUSINESS FORM UNKNOWN

Not Classified By Court

GLOBAL INDEMNITY GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUDORFER DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

STONE GENE S.

ASH PAUL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

3/31/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

4/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 04/06/2021

4/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 04/06/2021

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/7/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/26/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOUR WINDS RANCHS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOUR WINDS RANCHS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Motion for Summary Judgment

12/2/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement

12/2/2020: Separate Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT KARL KRA VES' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET TWO AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

12/29/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT KARL KRA VES' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET TWO AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT KARL KRAVES' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET TWO AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

12/29/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT KARL KRAVES' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET TWO AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

1/12/2021: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); HEARING ON MOTION - OTHE...)

1/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); HEARING ON MOTION - OTHE...)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GENE S. STONE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KARL KRAVES MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS FURTHER RESPONSES TO THE REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENT SET TWO AND REQUEST

9/2/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GENE S. STONE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KARL KRAVES MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS FURTHER RESPONSES TO THE REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENT SET TWO AND REQUEST

Separate Statement

9/2/2020: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

9/2/2020: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JENNIFER FERES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KARL KRAVES MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS FURTHER RESPONSES TO THE REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET TWO AND REQUE

9/2/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JENNIFER FERES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KARL KRAVES MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS FURTHER RESPONSES TO THE REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET TWO AND REQUE

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT KARL KRAVES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AG

9/2/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT KARL KRAVES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AG

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT KARL KRAVES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR

9/2/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT KARL KRAVES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • Hearing06/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by KARL KRAVES, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 3:25 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review - Notice of Settlement) of 04/06/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review - Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by KEVIN SMITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by FOUR WINDS RANCH, business form unknown (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by FOUR WINDS RANCH, business form unknown (Defendant); KARL KRAVES, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by KEVIN SMITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by KEVIN SMITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by KEVIN SMITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KEVIN SMITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KEVIN SMITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KEVIN SMITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLOBAL INDEMNITY GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUDORFER DAVID