This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2023 at 07:50:25 (UTC).

KEVIN REYES VS MARIA'S HOLDINGS CORP., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 KEVIN REYES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MARIA'S HOLDINGS CORP ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN, LIA MARTIN and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3798

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

LIA MARTIN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REYES KEVIN

Defendants

BEST ITALIAN KITCHEN IN TOWN INC.

MARIA'S HOLDINGS CORP.

MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN DOWNTOWN LA INC.

MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN INC.

MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN MDR LLC

MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN NUMBER EIGHT INC.

MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN NUMBER NINE LLC

MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN NUMBER SEVEN LLC

MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN NUMBER SIX LLC

MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN OXNARD LLC

MAX ZR

MIK LARCHMONT LLC

MIK MONTANA LLC

NICK AT NORTHRIDGE INC.

THE ORIGINAL MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAKIMI HELGA

Defendant Attorney

MCWILLIAM ANNE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Joint Status Conference Report

9/1/2023: Joint Status Conference Report

Notice of Ruling

2/9/2023: Notice of Ruling

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE - MONICA CASTANEDA, #10323

1/31/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE - MONICA CASTANEDA, #10323

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS REPRESENT...)

1/31/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS REPRESENT...)

Order - ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS PROCEEDINGS

1/31/2023: Order - ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFT'S. AT...)

1/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFT'S. AT...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT HARMOR

1/24/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT HARMOR

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RUBEN HERRERA

1/24/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RUBEN HERRERA

Request for Dismissal

1/24/2023: Request for Dismissal

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

1/24/2023: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Case Management Statement

1/24/2023: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS PROCEEDINGS

1/18/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS PROCEEDINGS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVIN REYES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS PROCEEDINGS

1/18/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVIN REYES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS PROCEEDINGS

Case Management Statement

1/17/2023: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANNE MCWILLIAMS RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON AUGUST 4, 2022 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/17/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANNE MCWILLIAMS RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON AUGUST 4, 2022 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATES

11/30/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATES

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS REPRESENTATIVE CLAIMS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY THIS ACTION

11/30/2022: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS REPRESENTATIVE CLAIMS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY THIS ACTION

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2024
  • Hearing06/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 06/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 09/07/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/13/2024 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Anne McWilliam (Attorney): First Name changed from Veenita to Anne; Last Name changed from Raj to McWilliam; Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Kevin Reyes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Maria's Holdings Corp. (Defendant); Best Italian Kitchen In Town, Inc. (Defendant); Maria's Italian Kitchen, Inc. (Defendant); Maria's Italian Kitchen Number Six, LLC (Defendant); Maria's Italian Kitchen Number Seven, LLC (Defendant); Maria's Italian Kitchen Number Nine, LLC (Defendant); Max ZR (Defendant); Nick at Northridge Inc. (Defendant); The Original Maria's Italian Kitchen, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/31/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 09/07/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCourt's Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay or Dismiss Proceedings; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. David J. Cowan; Reason: Deemed Non-Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Non--Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAddress for Orlando Villalba (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kevin Reyes (Plaintiff); As to: Maria's Holdings Corp. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kevin Reyes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less