This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2022 at 01:46:14 (UTC).

KEVIN LOFTON VS ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/22/2018 KEVIN LOFTON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9034

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LIFTON KEVIN

LOFTON KEVIN

Defendants

JEFFERIS CHRIS

STARRATT KIMBERLY

ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS INC.

WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT LL

Not Classified By Court

ATTORNEY JOEL GLASER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GLASER JOEL PERRY

GLASER JOEL

Defendant Attorneys

GRADSTEIN RACHEL L.

GRADSTEIN RACHEL LESLIE

NUNEZ JENNIFER ROSE

CAIN PATRICK J.

 

Court Documents

Status Conference Statement

6/28/2022: Status Conference Statement

Status Conference Statement

6/30/2022: Status Conference Statement

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLCS NOTICE OF ERRATA RE SIGNED DECLARATION OF MICHELLE WALTER

7/5/2022: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLCS NOTICE OF ERRATA RE SIGNED DECLARATION OF MICHELLE WALTER

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO TEMPORARILY LIFT THE STAY AND GRANT A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

7/5/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO TEMPORARILY LIFT THE STAY AND GRANT A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE WALTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLCS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO TEMPORARILY LIFT THE STAY AND GRANT A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING OR

7/5/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE WALTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLCS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO TEMPORARILY LIFT THE STAY AND GRANT A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING OR

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER R. NUNEZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLCS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO TEMPORARILY LIFT THE STAY AND GRANT A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING

7/5/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER R. NUNEZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLCS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO TEMPORARILY LIFT THE STAY AND GRANT A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO TEMPORARILY LIFT THE STAY ...)

7/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO TEMPORARILY LIFT THE STAY ...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED EX PARTE

7/6/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED EX PARTE

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

7/6/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO GRANT A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

7/7/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO GRANT A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL WALTER IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

7/7/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL WALTER IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER R. NUNEZ IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO GRANT A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

7/7/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER R. NUNEZ IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO GRANT A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SELECTION OF ARBITRATOR

3/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SELECTION OF ARBITRATOR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: $2...)

3/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: $2...)

Joint Status Conference Report

4/4/2022: Joint Status Conference Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

4/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

Notice of Continuance

4/12/2022: Notice of Continuance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

4/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • Hearing07/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • Hearing07/08/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Temporarily Lift the Stay and Grant a Temporary Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • Hearing07/08/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Jennifer R. Nunez in Support of Ex Parte Application to Grant a Temporary Restraining Order); Filed by WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Michael Walter in Support of Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order); Filed by WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Grant a Temporary Restraining Order); Filed by WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Temporarily Lift the Stay and Grant a Temporary Restraining Order) - Not Held - Trailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Temporarily Lift the Stay ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Continued Ex Parte); Filed by WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LL (Defendant); CHRIS JEFFERIS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed (ON BEHALF OF: WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLC AND CHRIS JEFFERIS ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketAnswer To Plantiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LL (Defendant); CHRIS JEFFERIS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Unverified Complaint (ON BEHALF OF: ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. AND KIMBERLY STARRATT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. (Defendant); KIMBERLY STARRATT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kevin Lofton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kevin Lofton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLASER, JOEL P.