This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2022 at 18:46:45 (UTC).

KEVIN KERNOHAN VS HERNAN BONILLA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 KEVIN KERNOHAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HERNAN BONILLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0848

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KERNOHAN KEVIN

Defendants

BONILLA HERNAN

DOMINO'S PIZZA LLC

PEREZ JOSUE

WEST VALLEY ENTERPRISES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALADZHYAN NICK

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/27/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/27/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/27/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/27/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/27/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

7/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/13/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2024
  • Hearing06/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2023
  • Hearing12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2023
  • Hearing12/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by KEVIN KERNOHAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by KEVIN KERNOHAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by KEVIN KERNOHAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by KEVIN KERNOHAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KEVIN KERNOHAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KEVIN KERNOHAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KEVIN KERNOHAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KEVIN KERNOHAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST VALLEY ENTERPRISES INCORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DOMINOS PIZZA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALADZHYAN NICK