This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2019 at 09:48:25 (UTC).

KEVIN FATEN VS BRIAN MARCOS RIVAS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/26/2018 KEVIN FATEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRIAN MARCOS RIVAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8084

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FATEN KEVIN

Defendants

SKY READY MIX INC

RIVAS BRIAN MARCOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAKIM SHARONA ESLAMBOLY

ESLAMBOLY-HAKIM SHARONA ESLAMBOLY

Defendant Attorney

DWYER ROBERT JAMES

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/24/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

9/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/21/2019

8/21/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/21/2019

Notice of Settlement

8/5/2019: Notice of Settlement

Other - - Other - civil deposit re Jury Fees $150.00

11/5/2018: Other - - Other - civil deposit re Jury Fees $150.00

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/8/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

11/15/2018: Notice - Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Answer

11/15/2018: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

11/15/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/28/2018: Answer

STANDING ORDER

2/8/2018: STANDING ORDER

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

6/26/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

6/26/2018: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

6/26/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kevin Faten (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 08/21/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Brian Marcos Rivas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Brian Marcos Rivas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sky Ready Mix, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kevin Faten (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketOther - (civil deposit re Jury Fees $150.00); Filed by Kevin Faten (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketSTANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sky Ready Mix Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DWYER ROBERT JAMES