This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2023 at 09:13:00 (UTC).

KEVIN EARL HOLLOMAN ET AL VS ALONSO FLORES ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/24/2017 KEVIN EARL HOLLOMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALONSO FLORES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0722

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOLLOMAN KEVIN EARL

HOLLOMAN VASHTI

Defendants

FLOREZ ARACELI

FLORES ALONSO

Not Classified By Court

NEWPORT CARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEGEREDCHIAN ALEX

Defendant Attorney

MOTSCHENBACHER AARON S.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/1/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (CONTINUED DUE TO DARK ...)

9/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (CONTINUED DUE TO DARK ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 09/10/2019

9/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 09/10/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

9/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/3/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO KASRA ROWSHAN, MDS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DECLARATION OF PAUL W. SANDE

9/3/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO KASRA ROWSHAN, MDS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DECLARATION OF PAUL W. SANDE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/3/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/3/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/3/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Motion for Reconsideration

8/23/2019: Motion for Reconsideration

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER SETTING COMPENSATION OF TREATING PHYSICIAN KASRA ROWSHAN, MD

6/20/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER SETTING COMPENSATION OF TREATING PHYSICIAN KASRA ROWSHAN, MD

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/20/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING EXPERT FEES PURSUANT TO C...)

6/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING EXPERT FEES PURSUANT TO C...)

Notice of Ruling

6/28/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion re: - MOTION RE: RECONSIDERATION OF THE JUNE 27, 2019 COURT ORDER SETTING COMPENSATION OF KASRA ROWSHAN

7/15/2019: Motion re: - MOTION RE: RECONSIDERATION OF THE JUNE 27, 2019 COURT ORDER SETTING COMPENSATION OF KASRA ROWSHAN

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/29/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PAUL W. SANDE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANTS ALONSO FLORES AND ARACELI FLORES FOR AN ORDER SETTING COMPENSATION OF KASRA ROWSHAN, MD

6/5/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PAUL W. SANDE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANTS ALONSO FLORES AND ARACELI FLORES FOR AN ORDER SETTING COMPENSATION OF KASRA ROWSHAN, MD

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute scheduled for 11/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 11/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketLegacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal scheduled for 10/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by KEVIN EARL HOLLOMAN ET AL on 10/24/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by KEVIN EARL HOLLOMAN and VASHTI HOLLOMAN as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: ALONSO FLORES (Defendant); ARACELI FLOREZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute scheduled for 11/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 11/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Alex Megeredchian (Attorney): First Name: Alex; Last Name: Megeredchian; Organization Name changed from Megeredchian, Alex, Esq, LAW OFFICES to Megeredchian Law

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketAddress for Alex Megeredchian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration (Continued due to Dark ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial scheduled for 04/24/2019 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 09/10/2019 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by: KEVIN EARL HOLLOMAN (Plaintiff); VASHTI HOLLOMAN (Plaintiff); As to: KEVIN EARL HOLLOMAN (Plaintiff); VASHTI HOLLOMAN (Plaintiff); ALONSO FLORES (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 04/09/2019 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08/27/2019 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 3 - Hon. Jon R. Takasugieffective 02/04/2019; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketDocument:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 04/09/19 at 10:00 am Marc D. Gross

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Jury Trial 04/24/19 at 8:30 am Marc D. Gross

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 10/26/20 at 8:30 am Marc D. Gross

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less