This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 02:36:35 (UTC).

KEVIN DYAS, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ALEXANDER RODRIGUEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 KEVIN DYAS, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALEXANDER RODRIGUEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7783

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DYAS AN INDIVIDUAL KEVIN

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ AN INDIVIDUAL ALEXANDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROFAEL JOHN R.

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

8/9/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/29/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2024
  • Hearing07/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • Hearing01/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • Hearing01/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KEVIN DYAS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KEVIN DYAS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KEVIN DYAS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROFAEL JOHN R.