Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2021 at 08:40:33 (UTC).

KEVIN BRISCOE VS BENEVIS HOLDING CORP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2020 KEVIN BRISCOE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BENEVIS HOLDING CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5303

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRISCOE KEVIN

Defendants

KOOL SMILES HOLDING CORP.

BENEVIS LLC

DPMS INC

BENEVIS HOLDING CORP

LT SMILES CORP.

BENEVIS HOLDING CORP.

DPMS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PITTMAN ALVIN

PITTMAN ALVIN L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

3/19/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF KOOL SMILES HOLDING CORP...)

3/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF KOOL SMILES HOLDING CORP...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF KOOL SMILES HOLDING CORP...) OF 03/19/2021

3/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF KOOL SMILES HOLDING CORP...) OF 03/19/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY

2/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALVIN L. PITTMAN IN RESPONSE TO OSC

2/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALVIN L. PITTMAN IN RESPONSE TO OSC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...)

2/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/01/2020

12/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/01/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

7/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/24/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/22/2020: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • Hearing06/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal of Kool Smiles Holding Corp and DPMS, Inc.) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Kool Smiles Holding Corp...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Kool Smiles Holding Corp...) of 03/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions Against Plaintiff and Defendant for Failure to Appear In Person or Via LA CourtConnect on 12/01/2020 and Failure to File a Notice of Bankruptcy If One Has Been Filed) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Alvin L. Pittman in Response to OSC); Filed by Kevin Briscoe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Bankruptcy); Filed by Kevin Briscoe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kevin Briscoe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kevin Briscoe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kevin Briscoe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kevin Briscoe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kevin Briscoe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BENEVIS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DPMS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PITTMAN ALVIN LEONARD