This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2021 at 04:54:24 (UTC).

KEVIN ADLEY VS STK STEAKHOUSE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 KEVIN ADLEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STK STEAKHOUSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2994

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADLEY KEVIN

Defendants

PROSTATE CANCER FOUNDATION

PETS IN NEED

W HOTEL

DREW PENSKY INC

THE ONE GROUP HOSPITALITY INC

PINSKY DR. DREW

THE ONE GROUP INC.

STK STEAKHOUSE

W HOTEL MANAGEMENT INC.

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC.

STK WESTWOOD LLC

THE ONE GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALKER JOHN M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/28/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/9/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

9/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2023
  • Hearing08/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Hearing02/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Hearing02/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kevin Adley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kevin Adley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kevin Adley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STK WESTWOOD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The One Group Hospitality Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where W HOTEL MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant