This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2022 at 19:47:57 (UTC).

KEV ZEITONIAN VS CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 KEV ZEITONIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0326

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZEITONIAN KEV

Defendants

BROADSPIRE SERVICES INC.

CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEOSIAN HAROUT GREG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/1/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/1/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

6/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • Hearing11/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • Hearing08/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kev Zeitonian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kev Zeitonian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kev Zeitonian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kev Zeitonian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kev Zeitonian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Broadspire Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Continental Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEOSIAN HAROUT GREG