This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2021 at 03:23:45 (UTC).

KERRIN TSO VS DAVID GREENE ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/18/2018 KERRIN TSO filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against DAVID GREENE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG, MEL RED RECANA and DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0298

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

MEL RED RECANA

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TSO KERRIN

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 10

GREENE DAVID

GREENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MIRELL DOUGLAS E. ESQ.

MIRELL DOUGLAS E.(FAX: 310 553 0687)

KUNSTLER PETER MICHAEL

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

DANIELS FINE ISRAEL SCHONBUCK & LEBOVITS

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C C P

7/24/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C C P

DECLARATION OF KERRIN TSO IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/24/2018: DECLARATION OF KERRIN TSO IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF DAVID GREENE

7/30/2018: DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF DAVID GREENE

DEFENDANT DAVID GREENE'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 425.16

7/30/2018: DEFENDANT DAVID GREENE'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 425.16

Minute Order -

8/7/2018: Minute Order -

Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - APPELLANT'S AMENDED NOTICE DESIGTNATING RECORD ON APPEAL

10/12/2018: Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - APPELLANT'S AMENDED NOTICE DESIGTNATING RECORD ON APPEAL

Substitution of Attorney

10/31/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order -

5/25/2018: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S MAY 14, 2018, ORDER

5/24/2018: PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S MAY 14, 2018, ORDER

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

5/25/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

4/24/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER: (1) SETTING A HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY; ETC

4/18/2018: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER: (1) SETTING A HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY; ETC

PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER: (1) SETTING A HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY; (2) VACATING THE MAY 29, 2018, HEARING ON DEFENDANT?S C.C.P. 425.1

4/18/2018: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER: (1) SETTING A HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY; (2) VACATING THE MAY 29, 2018, HEARING ON DEFENDANT?S C.C.P. 425.1

DEFENDANT DAVID GREENE'S NOTICE OF SPECIAL MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 425.16; ETC

3/22/2018: DEFENDANT DAVID GREENE'S NOTICE OF SPECIAL MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 425.16; ETC

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/15/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

2/9/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

1/18/2018: COMPLAINT

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2018
  • Docketat 08:35 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketNotice (of Withdrawal of Defendant David Greene's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Filed and Served on 10/5/18); Filed by David Greene (DISMISSED) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketAbandonment of Appeal Submitted APP-005/107 CR-137/145

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketClerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Peter Michael Kunstler (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketNtc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (APPELLANT'S AMENDED NOTICE DESIGTNATING RECORD ON APPEAL); Filed by Kerrin Tso (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketResp Notice Electing Appendix Submitted APP-011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketMotion for Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketNtc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-01-29 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Kerrin Tso (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Kerrin Tso (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kerrin Tso (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where . Greene is a litigant