This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2022 at 10:51:18 (UTC).

KERI GALLOWAY, ET AL. VS MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC., AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 KERI GALLOWAY, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC , AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4053

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GALLOWAY KERI

GEORGES LISA

Defendants

LOGISTICS HEALTH INC.

THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION

MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NORIJANIAN ARIN

SHAKOURI ASHKAN Y.

Defendant Attorneys

HALL JUSTIN P.

MACGREGOR ELIZABETH J.

PALEY ANDREW M.

LAMAR KARIMAH J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Judicial Notice

11/21/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/21/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Judicial Notice

11/21/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF LISA GEORGES OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS LOGISTICS HEALTH, INC. AND MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

11/21/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF LISA GEORGES OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS LOGISTICS HEALTH, INC. AND MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF KERI GALLOWAYS AMENDED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION AND MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

11/21/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF KERI GALLOWAYS AMENDED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION AND MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF KERI GALLOWAYS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS LOGISTICS HEALTH, INC. AND MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

11/21/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF KERI GALLOWAYS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS LOGISTICS HEALTH, INC. AND MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Request for Judicial Notice

11/21/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/15/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION UPDATED DECLARATION OF JENNIFER MRUMLINSKI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL KERI GALLOWAY TO ARBITRATION

11/15/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION UPDATED DECLARATION OF JENNIFER MRUMLINSKI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL KERI GALLOWAY TO ARBITRATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/19/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Ruling

10/19/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, MEDIX STAFFING ...)

10/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, MEDIX STAFFING ...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

10/11/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ARIN NORIJANIAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATI

10/11/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ARIN NORIJANIAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATI

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/11/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

10/11/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

10/11/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

10/11/2022: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • Hearing06/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • Hearing05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketOpposition PLAINTIFF KERI GALLOWAYS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS LOGISTICS HEALTH, INC. AND MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; Filed by: Keri Galloway (Plaintiff); Lisa Georges (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketOpposition PLAINTIFF LISA GEORGES OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS LOGISTICS HEALTH, INC. AND MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; Filed by: Keri Galloway (Plaintiff); Lisa Georges (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Keri Galloway (Plaintiff); Lisa Georges (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Keri Galloway (Plaintiff); Lisa Georges (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Keri Galloway (Plaintiff); Lisa Georges (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Keri Galloway (Plaintiff); Lisa Georges (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
157 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC., an Illinois Corporation to Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- The Illumination Foundation (Defendant): Organization Name changed from THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION, a California Nonprofit Public Benefit Corporation to The Illumination Foundation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Logistics Health Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from LOGISTICS HEALTH INC., a Wisconsin Corporation to Logistics Health Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Arin Norijanian (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Arin James LLP to Arin | James LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketAddress for Arin Norijanian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: KERI GALLOWAY (Plaintiff); LISA GEORGES, individually and on behalf all other aggrieved employees of DEFENDANTS (Plaintiff); As to: MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC., an Illinois Corporation (Defendant); THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION, a California Nonprofit Public Benefit Corporation (Defendant); LOGISTICS HEALTH INC., a Wisconsin Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: KERI GALLOWAY (Plaintiff); LISA GEORGES, individually and on behalf all other aggrieved employees of DEFENDANTS (Plaintiff); As to: MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC., an Illinois Corporation (Defendant); THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION, a California Nonprofit Public Benefit Corporation (Defendant); LOGISTICS HEALTH INC., a Wisconsin Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KERI GALLOWAY (Plaintiff); LISA GEORGES, individually and on behalf all other aggrieved employees of DEFENDANTS (Plaintiff); As to: MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC., an Illinois Corporation (Defendant); THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION, a California Nonprofit Public Benefit Corporation (Defendant); LOGISTICS HEALTH INC., a Wisconsin Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Christopher K. Lui in Department 76 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS INC. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Illumination Foundation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAMAR KARIMAH JAMILAH-AKILAH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACGREGOR ELIZABETH JARVIS