This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2022 at 16:08:04 (UTC).

KERGIE MIESNER, ET AL. VS ROBERT CARR

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 KERGIE MIESNER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROBERT CARR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS J. LANDIN and LAWRENCE P. RIFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5146

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DENNIS J. LANDIN

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIESNER KERGIE

MIESNER THOMAS

Defendant

CARR ROBERT DBA RFB CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEFF MICHAEL D.

Defendant Attorney

HURRELL THOMAS CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Answer

12/16/2021: Answer

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 585 CCP IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT MICHAEL D. ZEFF IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY COURT AGAI

10/29/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 585 CCP IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT MICHAEL D. ZEFF IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY COURT AGAI

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/5/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/22/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Substitution of Attorney

12/7/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

12/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

8/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/1/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

7/9/2021: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/9/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Proof of Personal Service

6/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/21/2021: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • Hearing02/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Robert Carr (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Lawrence P. Riff, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Robert Carr (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Robert Carr (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Robert Carr (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Lawrence P. Riff, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 51, Lawrence P. Riff, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kergie Miesner (Plaintiff); Thomas Miesner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Robert Carr (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Kergie Miesner (Plaintiff); Thomas Miesner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kergie Miesner (Plaintiff); Thomas Miesner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kergie Miesner (Plaintiff); Thomas Miesner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kergie Miesner (Plaintiff); Thomas Miesner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kergie Miesner (Plaintiff); Thomas Miesner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURRELL, THOMAS C