This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 22:47:19 (UTC).

KEONG M JOUNG MD VS ALGOS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/21/2017 KEONG M JOUNG MD filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ALGOS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1413

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

JOUNG KEONG (CURTIS) M. M.D.

JOUNG KEONG CURTIS M. M.D.

Defendants and Respondents

VARGA CLAYTON

SYNOVATION HOLDINGS LLC

HEALTHCARE PARTNERS LLC

HEALTHCARE PARTNERS A DAVITA MEDICAL

SYNOVATION MEDICAL GROUP

ALGOS INC

HEATHCARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP

DAVITA HEALTHCARE PARTNERS PLAN LLC

DAVITA INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RUTTEN HOWARD ESQ.

DERUBERTIS DAVID M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

LAU WENDY M.

VERDE VINCE M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

2/21/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/15/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/29/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

5/26/2017: Minute Order

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

5/26/2017: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/21/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/21/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/26/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/26/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/26/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

7/27/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

8/14/2017: Unknown

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT AND ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT

8/28/2017: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT AND ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT

Minute Order

8/29/2017: Minute Order

ORDER APPOINTING CQURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

8/29/2017: ORDER APPOINTING CQURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order

8/29/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

9/13/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

Minute Order

10/4/2017: Minute Order

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73; (Order to Show Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Keong (Curtis) M. M.D. Joung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73; (Order to Show Cause; Moot) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • at 3:00 PM in Department 73; Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Healthcare Partners, LLC (Defendant); Healthcare Partners, a DaVita Medical (Defendant); Heathcare Partners, Medical Group (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2017
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Keong (Curtis) M. M.D. Joung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Keong (Curtis) M. M.D. Joung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Keong (Curtis) M. M.D. Joung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. RETALIATION IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE SECTION 1102.5; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SYNOVATION MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where ALGOS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DAVITA HEALTH PLAN OF CALIFORNIA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTHCARE PARTNERS is a litigant