This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2023 at 03:39:39 (UTC).

KENYON PLASTERING OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC. VS ZWICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 KENYON PLASTERING OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ZWICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CARY NISHIMOTO and GARY Y. TANAKA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0496

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CARY NISHIMOTO

GARY Y. TANAKA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENYON PLASTERING OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INC.

Defendants

ZWICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

ONE SOUTH OWNERS ASSOCIATION

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

EHOF II REDONDO BEACH LLC

FARMERS AND MERCHANTS BANK OF LONG BEACH

RLI INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAIRETTA WENDI

Defendant Attorneys

POTTER TREVOR

GERMAIN MICHAEL

HAMMOCK WAYNE H

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

10/26/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN FEES AND COSTS

10/25/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN FEES AND COSTS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

5/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

11/23/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

11/23/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

11/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

10/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

9/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

Case Management Statement

8/23/2021: Case Management Statement

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Kenyon Plastering of Southern California, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Kenyon Plastering of Southern California, Inc. on 07/17/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Kenyon Plastering of Southern California, Inc. as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 01/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/14/2023 at 10:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 10:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Each party to bear their own fees and costs: Name Extension: Each party to bear their own fees and costs; As To Parties: Zwick Construction Company (Defendant); Western Surety Company (Defendant); One South Owners Association (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Kenyon Plastering of Southern California, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Further Status Conference scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01/30/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default scheduled for 11/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kenyon Plastering of Southern California, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Zwick Construction Company (Defendant); Western Surety Company (Defendant); One South Owners Association (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kenyon Plastering of Southern California, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Zwick Construction Company (Defendant); Western Surety Company (Defendant); One South Owners Association (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Kenyon Plastering of Southern California, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Zwick Construction Company (Defendant); Western Surety Company (Defendant); One South Owners Association (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kenyon Plastering of Southern California, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Zwick Construction Company (Defendant); Western Surety Company (Defendant); One South Owners Association (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deirdre Hill in Department M Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KENYON PLASTERING OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ZWICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EHOF II REDONDO BEACH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RLI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant