This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 04:53:33 (UTC).

KENYA DENNIS VS CITY OF SANTA MONICA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2022 KENYA DENNIS filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF SANTA MONICA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5003

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DENNIS KENYA

Defendants

CITY OF SANTA MONICA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRUCKER BARRY A

 

Court Documents

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

11/3/2022: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Complaint

11/3/2022: Complaint

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

11/3/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/3/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/3/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

12/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/3/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2024
  • Hearing10/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2024
  • Hearing05/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2024
  • Hearing04/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kenya Dennis (Plaintiff); As to: City of Santa Monica (Defendant); Service Date: 12/22/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kenya Dennis (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant); Service Date: 12/20/2022; Service Cost: 80.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kenya Dennis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kenya Dennis (Plaintiff); As to: City of Santa Monica (Defendant); County of Los Angeles (Defendant); Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kenya Dennis (Plaintiff); As to: City of Santa Monica (Defendant); County of Los Angeles (Defendant); Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA MONICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DRUCKER BARRY A