This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2022 at 00:46:33 (UTC).

KENT SIMMONDS VS MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 KENT SIMMONDS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2351

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMMONDS KENT

Defendants

LOS ANGELES-M INC. DBA KEYES EUROPEAN

MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOLONZ ADAM MARTIN

Defendant Attorney

LEACH BRIAN E

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/20/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/20/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

2/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/2/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

4/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kent Simmonds (Plaintiff); Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant); Los Angeles-M, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles-M, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kent Simmonds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kent Simmonds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kent Simmonds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kent Simmonds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kent Simmonds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES-M INC. DBA KEYES EUROPEAN is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZOLONZ ADAM M.