This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 14:00:50 (UTC).

KENNETH SMITH VS KND DEVELOPMENT 52, L.L.C., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 KENNETH SMITH filed an Other lawsuit against KND DEVELOPMENT 52, L L C ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1801

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH KENNETH

Defendants

BASA-REYES FIONA

KND DEVELOPMENT 52 L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

MCCANN DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/5/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/4/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

12/27/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

Notice of Attachment

12/27/2022: Notice of Attachment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DANIEL MCCANN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION

12/27/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DANIEL MCCANN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

12/21/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

Demand for Jury Trial

12/21/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

12/21/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/21/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/12/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Personal Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Motion for Trial Preference

11/21/2022: Motion for Trial Preference

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

11/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/15/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/14/2022: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Kenneth Smith on 11/14/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Kenneth Smith as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Trial Preference scheduled for 01/10/2023 at 09:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Case numbers on Dismissal is wrong - Rejected; Submitted by: Kenneth Smith (Plaintiff); As to: KND Development 52, L.L.C. (Defendant); Fiona Basa-Reyes (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Case numbers on Dismissal is wrong: As To Parties changed from KND Development 52, L.L.C. (Defendant), Fiona Basa-Reyes (Defendant) to KND Development 52, L.L.C. (Defendant), Fiona Basa-Reyes (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Kenneth Smith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Kenneth Smith (Plaintiff); As to: KND Development 52, L.L.C. (Defendant); Fiona Basa-Reyes (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketOpposition Opposition to Motion for Trial Preference; Filed by: KND Development 52, L.L.C. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Daniel McCann in support of Opposition; Filed by: KND Development 52, L.L.C. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department O Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNotice notice of remote appearance; Filed by: Kenneth Smith (Plaintiff); As to: KND Development 52, L.L.C. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kenneth Smith (Plaintiff); As to: KND Development 52, L.L.C. (Defendant); Fiona Basa-Reyes (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kenneth Smith (Plaintiff); As to: KND Development 52, L.L.C. (Defendant); Fiona Basa-Reyes (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kenneth Smith (Plaintiff); As to: KND Development 52, L.L.C. (Defendant); Fiona Basa-Reyes (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less