This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 10:11:29 (UTC).

KENNETH ROAD PHARMACY INC ET AL VS RETURNCO ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/10/2017 KENNETH ROAD PHARMACY INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RETURNCO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7329

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

KAZARIAN MARGARITA

PARK WEST PHARMACY INC

KENNETH ROAD PHARMACY INC

Defendants and Respondents

RETURNCO

DOES 1 TO 20

KO YOUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

ARMINAK TAMAR G.

AZIZIAN ARBELLA ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SHAFFIE SHAWN

 

Court Documents

Unknown

5/9/2018: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/14/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANT RETURNCO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED REQUEST AND RESPONSES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF MARGARITA KAZARIAN'S ANSWERS AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (SET ONE)

1/24/2018: DEFENDANT RETURNCO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED REQUEST AND RESPONSES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF MARGARITA KAZARIAN'S ANSWERS AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (SET ONE)

DEFENDANT RETURNCO'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MARGARITA KAZARIAN'S ANSWERS AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); ETC

1/24/2018: DEFENDANT RETURNCO'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MARGARITA KAZARIAN'S ANSWERS AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); ETC

DEFENDANT RETURNCO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED REQUEST AND RESPONSES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF MARGARITA KAZARIAN'S ANSWERS AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

1/24/2018: DEFENDANT RETURNCO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED REQUEST AND RESPONSES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF MARGARITA KAZARIAN'S ANSWERS AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

DEFENDANT RETURNCO'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MARGARITA KAZARIAN'S ANSWERS AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (SET ONE); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUP

1/24/2018: DEFENDANT RETURNCO'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MARGARITA KAZARIAN'S ANSWERS AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (SET ONE); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUP

DEFENDANTS YOUNG KO AND RETURNCO'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/25/2018: DEFENDANTS YOUNG KO AND RETURNCO'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE

1/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS KENNETH ROAD PHARMACY, INC. AND PARK WEST PHARMACY, INC. TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUC

1/22/2018: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS KENNETH ROAD PHARMACY, INC. AND PARK WEST PHARMACY, INC. TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUC

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

12/28/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF RULING

11/28/2017: NOTICE OF RULING

Minute Order

11/17/2017: Minute Order

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

11/17/2017: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED REQUESTS AND RESPONSES IN SUPPORT OF CONTEMPORANEOUS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

11/17/2017: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED REQUESTS AND RESPONSES IN SUPPORT OF CONTEMPORANEOUS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

11/17/2017: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

DFFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS KENNETH ROAD PHARMACY, INC. AND PARK WEST PHARMACY, INC. TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (S

11/17/2017: DFFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS KENNETH ROAD PHARMACY, INC. AND PARK WEST PHARMACY, INC. TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (S

DEFENDANT'S YOUNG KO AND RETURNCO'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT

11/9/2017: DEFENDANT'S YOUNG KO AND RETURNCO'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS YOUNG KO AND RETURNCO'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

11/9/2017: DEFENDANTS YOUNG KO AND RETURNCO'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48; (Motion to Compel; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48; (Motion to Compel; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48; (Motion to Compel; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Kenneth Road Pharmacy Inc (Plaintiff); Park West Pharmacy Inc (Plaintiff); Margarita Kazarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 23; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2017
  • CONTRACT AMENDED COMPLAINT (NUMBER): FFRST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Kenneth Road Pharmacy Inc (Plaintiff); Park West Pharmacy Inc (Plaintiff); Margarita Kazarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Kenneth Road Pharmacy Inc (Plaintiff); Park West Pharmacy Inc (Plaintiff); Margarita Kazarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Kenneth Road Pharmacy Inc (Plaintiff); Park West Pharmacy Inc (Plaintiff); Margarita Kazarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Kenneth Road Pharmacy Inc (Plaintiff); Park West Pharmacy Inc (Plaintiff); Margarita Kazarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less