This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/01/2023 at 08:45:56 (UTC).

KENNETH MATE, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS RACHAEL ABUAV, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 KENNETH MATE, AN INDIVIDUAL, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RACHAEL ABUAV, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0357

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

FIELDS AN INDIVIDUAL JILL

MATE AN INDIVIDUAL KENNETH

Defendants

ABUAV AN INDIVIDUAL RACHAEL

ARAGONES AN INDIVIDUAL MILAGROS A.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

ARAGONES AN INDIVIDUAL MILAGROS A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUCAS ESQ SPENCER R

Defendant Attorney

SCHONBUCH MICHAEL

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

REISINGER ROBERT L.

Cross Defendant Attorney

CLARK ALEC M

 

Court Documents

Answer

12/21/2022: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

11/29/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Association of Attorney

11/29/2022: Association of Attorney

Cross-Complaint

11/1/2022: Cross-Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial

11/1/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

11/1/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/1/2022: Answer

Answer

11/1/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/1/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

9/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

9/16/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/16/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/16/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/16/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2024
  • Hearing09/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2024
  • Hearing03/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2024
  • Hearing03/01/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Kenneth Mate, an Individual (Cross-Defendant); As to: Milagros A. Aragones, an Individual (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Rachael Abuav, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Rachael Abuav, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Craig W. Mackie (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Bretoi Lutz & Stele to Bretoi, Lutz & Stele

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Rachael Abuav, an Individual (Defendant); As to: Kenneth Mate, an Individual (Plaintiff); Jill Fields, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Rachael Abuav, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Milagros A. Aragones, an Individual (Defendant); As to: Kenneth Mate, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kenneth Mate, an Individual (Plaintiff); Jill Fields, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: Rachael Abuav, an Individual (Defendant); Milagros A. Aragones, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kenneth Mate, an Individual (Plaintiff); Jill Fields, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: Rachael Abuav, an Individual (Defendant); Milagros A. Aragones, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kenneth Mate, an Individual (Plaintiff); Jill Fields, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: Rachael Abuav, an Individual (Defendant); Milagros A. Aragones, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less