This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2020 at 19:44:06 (UTC).

KENNETH LIBICK VS A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2018 KENNETH LIBICK filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A O SMITH CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRIAN S. CURREY and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0965

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRIAN S. CURREY

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIBICK KENNETH

Defendants

TODD PIPE & SUPPLY

ADVANCE MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS INC.

DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

BEAZER EAST INC.

ARVINMERITOR INC

GRINNELL LLC

METACLAD INSULATION LLC

C.W. DRIVER INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

FAMILIAN CORPORATION

SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

CRANE CO.

PECK JONES CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

PACIFIC MECHANICAL CORPORATION

NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION

LAWSON MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS

MCNALLY INDUSTRIES INC.

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

A.O. SMITH CORPORATION

62 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

BARONIAN ROBERT H.

MILBRODT JEREMY D.

BLEICHNER BRAD D.

NORMAN JAMIE OEHRLE

ILETO ROCHELLE R.

HOPWOOD BETH C.

HARIRCHI N. NIKKI

POPOVICH JERRY C.

POND FRANCIS D.

FOLEY PATRICK JAMES

GEBHARDT JEFFREY MATSUZO

BLOMQUIST SONJA E.

CALARESO CHRISTINE DIANNE

HUGO EDWARD ROGER

OSTERTAG JAMES JOSEPH

DUMONT RICHARD DANA

PLATT WARREN EARL

LOVE MARK ANTHONY

TORRES JULIE ANN

FISHBACK STEPHEN MICHAEL

27 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CONNOR M. SCOTT IN SUPPORT OF METALCLAD INSULATION LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/10/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CONNOR M. SCOTT IN SUPPORT OF METALCLAD INSULATION LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

4/21/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/11/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (WRONGFUL DEATH)

8/9/2019: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (WRONGFUL DEATH)

Notice - Notice of Errata re Defendants Mechanical Drives & Belting, f/k/a L.A. Rubber Company, Foster Wheeler LLC and Nibco, Inc.'s reply in support of Motion To Quash deposition of Plaintiff Kenneth

1/2/2019: Notice - Notice of Errata re Defendants Mechanical Drives & Belting, f/k/a L.A. Rubber Company, Foster Wheeler LLC and Nibco, Inc.'s reply in support of Motion To Quash deposition of Plaintiff Kenneth

Request for Dismissal

1/7/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice - Notice Specially Appearing Defendant National Automotive Parts Association's Notice of Taking Off Calendar its Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdict

1/8/2019: Notice - Notice Specially Appearing Defendant National Automotive Parts Association's Notice of Taking Off Calendar its Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdict

Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application for an order admitting Amy C. Brimmage for Ford Motor Company pro hac vice

1/18/2019: Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application for an order admitting Amy C. Brimmage for Ford Motor Company pro hac vice

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of Plaintiff's Motion For Trial Preference

11/21/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of Plaintiff's Motion For Trial Preference

Answer

11/29/2018: Answer

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/4/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Opposition - Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Trial Preference

12/6/2018: Opposition - Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Trial Preference

Opposition - Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Trial Preference

12/7/2018: Opposition - Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Trial Preference

Proof of Personal Service

12/11/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Trial by Jury and Estimate of Length of Trial

12/13/2018: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Trial by Jury and Estimate of Length of Trial

Opposition - Opposition Defendant Genuine Parts Company's to Plaintiff's Motion for Preference in Trial Setting Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure, Section 36(A), (D) and (E)

12/5/2018: Opposition - Opposition Defendant Genuine Parts Company's to Plaintiff's Motion for Preference in Trial Setting Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure, Section 36(A), (D) and (E)

322 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • Hearing03/08/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Hearing02/22/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Hearing01/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Hearing12/03/2020 at 13:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Hearing12/02/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDefendant Metalclad Insulation LLC's Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgement or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication; Filed by Metaclad Insulation, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Metaclad Insulation, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Connor M. Scott in Support of Metalclad Insulation LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Metaclad Insulation, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance of Group Status Conference of Keller, Fishback & Jackson LLP Cases; Filed by Kenneth Libick (Plaintiff); Kevin Libick (Plaintiff); Jon E. Libick (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Kenneth Libick (Plaintiff); Kevin Libick (Plaintiff); Jon E. Libick (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
344 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer (Of Defendant SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.); Filed by Kenneth Libick (Plaintiff); SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial and Estimate of Length of Trial; Filed by Kenneth Libick (Plaintiff); FMC Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketDefendant FMC Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Personal Injuries - Asbestos; Filed by Kenneth Libick (Plaintiff); FMC Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kenneth Libick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kenneth Libick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kenneth Libick (Plaintiff); Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kenneth Libick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kenneth Libick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kenneth Libick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kenneth Libick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less