This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 07:08:18 (UTC).

KENNETH LAWSON, ET AL. VS CASH MCELROY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 KENNETH LAWSON, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CASH MCELROY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0298

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAWSON KENNETH

JOURDAIN-LAWSON MONIQUE

Defendants

J.E. GROUP LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MCELROY CASH DBA 5TH AMENDMENT MANAGEMENT CORP AKA WACK 100 DBA 5TH AMENDMENT ENTERTAINMENT INC. DBA CASH MONEY RECORDS INC.

YAMASHIRO AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

WILLIAMS RONALD AKA SLIM AKA CASH MONEY RECORDS INC. DBA CASH MONEY RECORDS WEST DBA 5TH AMENDMENT MANAGEMENT CORP. DBA 5TH AMENDMENT ENTERTAINMENT INC.

WILLIAMS BRIAN AKA BIRDMAN BIRDMAN DBA CASH MONEY RECORDS WEST AKA BIRDMAN BIRDMAN

1999 SYCAMORE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

5TH AMENDMENT ENTERTAINMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

5TH AMENDMENT MANAGEMENT CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CASH MONEY RECORDS INC. A LOUISIANA CORPORATION

CASH MONEY RECORDS WEST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARDS THOMAS KEY

SANDERS JUSTIN

SHIELDS MARK

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

9/1/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Service - No Service

4/27/2021: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service - No Service

4/27/2021: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service - No Service

5/26/2021: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service

5/26/2021: Proof of Service - No Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/9/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/10/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

6/14/2021: Answer

Answer

6/14/2021: Answer

Answer

6/14/2021: Answer

Proof of Service - No Service

6/15/2021: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service

6/15/2021: Proof of Service - No Service

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2024
  • Hearing03/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • Hearing09/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • Hearing08/30/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Kenneth Lawson (Plaintiff); Monique Jourdain-Lawson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Extending time for Defendants to Answer Complaint); Filed by Cash McElroy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by Kenneth Lawson (Plaintiff); Monique Jourdain-Lawson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kenneth Lawson (Plaintiff); Monique Jourdain-Lawson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kenneth Lawson (Plaintiff); Monique Jourdain-Lawson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kenneth Lawson (Plaintiff); Monique Jourdain-Lawson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kenneth Lawson (Plaintiff); Monique Jourdain-Lawson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kenneth Lawson (Plaintiff); Monique Jourdain-Lawson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kenneth Lawson (Plaintiff); Monique Jourdain-Lawson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less