This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2022 at 15:58:31 (UTC).

KENNETH KRANZ, , ET AL. VS AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 KENNETH KRANZ, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1456

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KRANZ KENNETH

KRANZ LUCINDA

Defendants

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

ALFA LAVAL INC.

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC.

BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY

CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION FKA COOPER CAMERON CORPORATION SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE COOPER-BESSEMER CORPORATION

CLA-VAL CO.

CRANE CO.

ELLIOTT COMPANY FKA ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY

FLOWSERVE US INC.

FMC CORPORATION FKA NORTHERN FIRE APPARATUS COMPANY

GARDNER DENVER INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

HOPEMAN BROTHERS INC.

HUNTINGTON INGALLS INCORPORATED FKA NORTHROP GRUMMAN SHIP SYSTEMS SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO NEWPORT NEWS SHIPBUILDING AND DRY DOCK COMPANY

HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES INC. FKA NORTHROP GRUMMAN SHIP SYSTEMS SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO NEWPORT NEWS SHIPBUILDING AND DRY DOCK COMPANY

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

J.T. THORPE & SON INC.

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PURDY STUART J.

 

Court Documents

Petition for Coordination

6/30/2022: Petition for Coordination

Unknown - COMPLAINT FOR OUT OF COUNTY COORDINATION

5/13/2022: Unknown - COMPLAINT FOR OUT OF COUNTY COORDINATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketPetition for Coordination; Filed by Kenneth Kranz, (Plaintiff); Lucinda Kranz, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint for Out of County Coordination; Filed by Kenneth Kranz, (Plaintiff); Lucinda Kranz, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant