This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2021 at 00:13:26 (UTC).

KENNETH K. LEE AND CATHERINE C. LEE, AS TRUSTEES OF THE LEE FAMILY TRUST, ET AL. VS RONI PACHECO

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 KENNETH K LEE AND CATHERINE C LEE, AS TRUSTEES OF THE LEE FAMILY TRUST filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against RONI PACHECO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1184

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KENNETH K. LEE AND CATHERINE C. LEE AS TRUSTEES OF THE LEE FAMILY TRUST

LEE TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO CHRISTINE K. LEE KENNETH K

LEE TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO MARGARET J. LEE KENNETH K

Defendant

PACHECO RONI DBA CALIMEX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SZKOLNIK FRED M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

9/2/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (RONI PACHECO)

9/2/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (RONI PACHECO)

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

9/1/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Application for Writ of Possession

9/29/2021: Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of - WRIT OF POSSESSION ONLY

9/29/2021: Writ of - WRIT OF POSSESSION ONLY

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment

9/28/2021: Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/28/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • Hearing01/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by KENNETH K. LEE AND CATHERINE C. LEE, AS TRUSTEES OF THE LEE FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO CHRISTINE K. LEE (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO MARGARET J. LEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketWrit of (Possession only); Filed by KENNETH K. LEE AND CATHERINE C. LEE, AS TRUSTEES OF THE LEE FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO CHRISTINE K. LEE (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO MARGARET J. LEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by KENNETH K. LEE AND CATHERINE C. LEE, AS TRUSTEES OF THE LEE FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO CHRISTINE K. LEE (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO MARGARET J. LEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by KENNETH K. LEE AND CATHERINE C. LEE, AS TRUSTEES OF THE LEE FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO CHRISTINE K. LEE (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO MARGARET J. LEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by KENNETH K. LEE AND CATHERINE C. LEE, AS TRUSTEES OF THE LEE FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO CHRISTINE K. LEE (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO MARGARET J. LEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by KENNETH K. LEE AND CATHERINE C. LEE, AS TRUSTEES OF THE LEE FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO CHRISTINE K. LEE (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO MARGARET J. LEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by KENNETH K. LEE AND CATHERINE C. LEE, AS TRUSTEES OF THE LEE FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO CHRISTINE K. LEE (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO MARGARET J. LEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((RONI PACHECO)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KENNETH K. LEE AND CATHERINE C. LEE, AS TRUSTEES OF THE LEE FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO CHRISTINE K. LEE (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO MARGARET J. LEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by KENNETH K. LEE AND CATHERINE C. LEE, AS TRUSTEES OF THE LEE FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO CHRISTINE K. LEE (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO MARGARET J. LEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KENNETH K. LEE AND CATHERINE C. LEE, AS TRUSTEES OF THE LEE FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO CHRISTINE K. LEE (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO MARGARET J. LEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KENNETH K. LEE AND CATHERINE C. LEE, AS TRUSTEES OF THE LEE FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO CHRISTINE K. LEE (Plaintiff); KENNETH K LEE, TRUSTEE OF THE LEE CHILDREN'S TRUST FBO MARGARET J. LEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SZKOLNIK FRED M.